Shortcut Tricks are very important things in competitive exam. Time takes a huge part in competitive exams. If you know how to manage time then you will surely do great in your exam. Most of us skip that part. Few examples on average shortcuts is given in this page below. All tricks on average are provided here. Visitors are requested to carefully read all shortcut examples. These examples here will help you to better understand shortcut tricks on average.

Before starting anything just do a math practice set. Choose any twenty math problems and write it down on a page. Do first ten maths using basic formula of this math topic. You also need to keep track of timing. Write down the time taken by you to solve those questions. Now practice our shortcut tricks on average and read examples carefully. After this do remaining ten questions and apply shortcut formula on those math problems. Again keep track of Timing. This time you will surely see improvement in your timing. But this is not all you want. You need to practice more to improve your timing more.

We all know that the most important thing in competitive exams is Mathematics. It doesn’t mean that other topics are not so important. But if you need a good score in exam then you have to score good in maths. You can get good score only by practicing more and more. You should do your math problems within time with correctness, and this can be achieved only by using shortcut tricks. But it doesn’t mean that you can’t do math problems without using any shortcut tricks. You may have that potential to do maths within time without using any shortcut tricks. But so many other people may not do the same. For those we prepared this average shortcut tricks. We try our level best to put together all types of shortcut methods here. But it possible we miss any. We appreciate if you share that with us. Your help will help others.

Average Methods Example 3

We can say that **average is an sum of n number and divided by n**.

We elaborate this a student score in 35, 56, 65 in three different subjects respectively, than the average score in subject is 35 + 56 + 65 / 3 = 52. So here is some average methods and shortcut tricks example 3 we discuss. This type of problem are given in Quantitative Aptitude which is a very essential paper in banking exam. Under below given some more example for your better practice.

Example #1

Samir obtained 75, 55, 89, 65 and 45 marks (out of 100) in Economy, Hindi, History, Geography and Environmental science. What would be his average marks?

- 66.8
- 65.8
- 62.6
- 60.5

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (B)

**How to Solve**

To find the average, we need to add all the obtain number then divide it by number of subject.

**Average:**75 + 55 + 89 + 65 + 45 / 5 = 65.8

**Rough Workspace**

Example #2

The average marks acquired by 140 students in a final examination is 32. If the average marks of failed students are 18 and the average marks of passed students are 38. What is the passed students in examination.

- 98
- 88
- 92
- 94

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (A)

**How to Solve**

Number of passed students are = Total students ( Total average – Failed average ) / Passed average – Failed average

= 140 ( 32 – 18 ) / ( 38 – 18 )

= 1960 / 20 = 98

**Rough Workspace**

Example #3

A city center has an average of 610 visitors on sunday and 340 on other days. The average number of visitors per day in a month of 30 days beginning with a Sunday is.

- 355
- 385
- 395
- 400

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (B)

**How to Solve**

Since the month begins with a Sunday, So there will be five Sundays in the month

= ( 610 x 5 + 340 x 25 ) / 30

= 3050 + 8500 / 30

= 11550 / 30 = 385.

**Rough Workspace**

Example #4

The average of 6 numbers is X and average of 3 of these is Y. If the average of the remaining 3 is Z, then

- 2x = 2y + 2z
- x = 2y + 2z
- x = y + z
- 2x = y + z

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (D)

**How to Solve**

Here we have x is average of three of these is y so, 3y and average of the remaining three is z so,

x = 3y + 3z / 6

x= 3 ( y + z ) / 6

x = ( y + z ) / 2

2x = y + z.

**Rough Workspace**

Example #5

The average marks of first 54 group members is 62 and second 62 group members is 65 and third 48 group members is 70 respectively. Then, what would be the average marks of all the students?

- 55.95
- 55.47
- 65.47
- 62.47

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (C)

**How to Solve**

**Step 1:**At First we find the total students marks according with 3 group

= ( 54 x 62 ) + ( 62 x 65 ) + ( 48 x 70 ) = ( 3348 + 4030 + 3360 ) = 10738.

**Step 2:**Now we need to find average marks of all three groups.

Total groups members are = ( 54 + 62 + 48 ) = 164.

Average marks of all the students = 10738 / 164 = 65.47.

**Rough Workspace**

### Few Examples of Average Shortcut Tricks

- Average Methods Example 1
- Average Methods Example 2
- Average Methods Example 4
- Average Methods Example 5
- Average Methods Example 6
- Hard Average Methods shortcut tricks
- << Go back to Average main page

We provide few shortcut tricks on this topic. Please visit this page to get updates on more Math Shortcut Tricks. You can also like our facebook page to get updates.

If You Have any question regarding this topic then please do comment on below section. You can also send us message on facebook.

Can u please post all tricks in hindi its a rqst thnk u

nice notes for averages,,,it helped me alot…………..

sir will u pl explain question no 5.I cannot understand that one .

pls recheck problems..

I found many mistake in the answer part.

Example:

In Q:4 After so you wrote 3s while it will 3z.

In Q:5 you entered 54*60 but it will 54*62.

Please correct it.

Thnks for the Amazing trick and method it’s very helpful 😊