**Multiplication of a Numbers Range Above 100 of Three digits Quick shortcut tricks **

Shortcut Tricks are very important things in competitive exam. Time takes a huge part in competitive exams. If you know time management then everything will be easier for you. Most of us miss that part. Few examples on multiplication of a numbers range above 100 of three digits shortcuts is given in this page below. All tricks on multiplication of a numbers range above 100 of three digits are provided here. Visitors are requested to carefully read all shortcut examples. You can understand shortcut tricks on Multiplication of a Numbers Range Above 100 of Three digits by these examples.

Before starting anything just do a math practice set. Choose any twenty math problems and write it down on a page. Using basic math formula do first ten maths of that page. You also need to keep track of the time. After solving all ten math questions write down total time taken by you to solve those questions. Now read our examples on multiplication of a numbers range above 100 of three digits shortcut tricks and practice few questions. After doing this go back to the remaining ten questions and solve those using shortcut methods. Again keep track of timing. You will surely see the improvement in your timing this time. But this is not all you want. You need to practice more to improve your timing more.

We all know that the most important thing in competitive exams is Mathematics. That doesn’t mean that other sections are not so important. But if you need a good score in exam then you have to score good in maths. You can get good score only by practicing more and more. The only thing you need to do is to do your math problems correctly and within time, and you can do this only by using shortcut tricks. But it doesn’t mean that you can’t do math problems without using any shortcut tricks. You may have that potential to do maths within time without using any shortcut tricks. But so many people can’t do this. For those we prepared this multiplication of a numbers range above 100 of three digits shortcut tricks. We always try to put all shortcut methods of the given topic. But it possible we miss any. We appreciate if you share that with us. Your help will help others.

Numbers are given for Multiplication of a Numbers Range Above 100 of three digits which is very time taking to calculate the numbers, So don’t worry here we given the Quick shortcut tricks to do quick calculation of multiplication of Three digits numbers by using of Multiplication of Quick shortcut tricks.

Example #1 – Multiplication of Numbers Range above 100 of Three digits

119 x 113= ?

The result of this multiplication is, 119 x 113= 13447.

Shortcut Tricks

- Multiply 119 with 1 and the result will be 119.
- Add a 00 to extreme right side of the result, 11900.
- Multiply 119 with 1 and the result will be 119.
- Add a 0 to extreme right side of the result, 1190.
- Multiply 119 with 3 and the result will be 357.
- In final step Add All result that is (11900 + 1190 + 357) and we got our result 13447.

Example #2 – Multiplication of Numbers Range above 100 of Three digits

149 x 158= ?

The result of this multiplication is, 149 x 158= 23542.

Shortcut Tricks

- Multiply 149 with 1 and the result will be 149.
- Add a 00 to extreme right side of the result, 14900.
- Multiply 149 with 5 and the result will be 745.
- Add a 0 to extreme right side of the result, 7450.
- Multiply 149 with 8 and the result will be 1192.
- In final step Add All result that is (14900 + 7450 + 1192) and we got our result 23542.

Example #3 – Multiplication of Numbers Range above 100 of Three digits

239 x 189= ?

The result of this multiplication is, 239 x 189= 45171.

Shortcut Tricks

- Multiply 239 with 1 and the result will be 239.
- Add a 00 to extreme right side of the result, 23900.
- Multiply 239 with 8 and the result will be 1912.
- Add a 0 to extreme right side of the result, 19120.
- Multiply 239 with 9 and the result will be 2151.
- In final step Add All result that is (23900 + 19120 + 2151) and we got our result 45171.

Example #4 – Multiplication of Numbers Range above 100 of Three digits

349 x 258= ?

The result of this multiplication is, 349 x 258= 90042.

Shortcut Tricks

- Multiply 349 with 2 and the result will be 698 .
- Add a 00 to extreme right side of the result, 69800.
- Multiply 349 with 5 and the result will be 1745.
- Add a 0 to extreme right side of the result, 17450.
- Multiply 349 with 8 and the result will be 2792.
- In final step Add All result that is (69800 + 17450 + 2792) and we got our result 90042.

### Few other examples of Multiplication Shortcut Tricks:

- Multiplication of Two digit number with another Two digit number
- Multiplication of Three digit number with Two digit number
- Multiplication of Three digit number with another Three digit number
- Multiplication of Four digit number with Two Digit number
- Multiplication of a number by 9
- Multiplication of large numbers by 5
- Multiplication of a number by 11
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range Below 50
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range above 50 & Below 100
- Multiplication of numbers more than 100 shortcut tricks
- Multiplication of less than 100-base Number tricks
- Multiplication of numbers new type shortcut tricks
- Multiplication a Number with 99
- Multiplying Numbers Ending In Zeros
- << Go back to Multiplication main page

We provide few shortcut tricks on this topic. Please visit this page to get updates on more Math Shortcut Tricks. You can also like our facebook page to get updates.

If You Have any question regarding this topic then please do comment on below section. You can also send us message on facebook.