**Multiplication of numbers more than 100 shortcut tricks**

Numbers are given for Multiplication of more than 100 Number which is very time taking to calculate the numbers, So don’t worry here we given the another Quick shortcut tricks to do quick calculation of Multiplication of numbers more than 100 shortcut tricks by using of another Multiplication of Quick shortcut tricks.

Multiplication of numbers More Than 100 shortcut tricks are very important thing to know for your exams. Time is the main factor in competitive exams. If you know how to manage time then you will surely do great in your exam. Most of us miss that part. Here in this page we give few examples on Multiplication of numbers More Than 100 shortcut tricks. These shortcut tricks cover all sorts of tricks on Multiplication of numbers More Than 100. Visitors please read carefully all shortcut examples. These examples will help you to understand shortcut tricks on Multiplication of numbers More Than 100.

Before starting anything just do a math practice set. Write down twenty math problems related to this topic on a page. Do first ten maths using basic formula of this math topic. You also need to keep track of the time. After solving all ten math questions write down total time taken by you to solve those questions. Now go through our page for multiplication of numbers more than 100 shortcut trick. After finishing this do remaining questions using Multiplication of numbers More Than 100 shortcut tricks. Again keep track of the time. The timing will be surely improved this time. But this is not all you need. You need to practice more to improve your timing more.

You all know that math portion is very much important in competitive exams. That doesn’t mean that other topics are less important. But if you need a good score in exam then you have to score good in maths. A good score comes with practice and practice. The only thing you need to do is to do your math problems correctly and within time, and only shortcut tricks can give you that success. But it doesn’t mean that without using shortcut tricks you can’t do any math problems. You may have that potential that you may do maths within time without using any shortcut tricks. But other peoples may not do the same. Here we prepared multiplication of numbers more than 100 shortcut tricks for those people. We always try to put all shortcut methods of the given topic. But if you see any tricks are missing from the list then please inform us. Your little help will help others.

Example #1 – Multiplication of Numbers More than 100

119 x 108 = ?

The result of this multiplication is, 119 x 108 = 12852.

Shortcut Tricks

- First of all subtract 100 from both the numbers,

i.e, (119 – 100) = 19 and (108 – 100) = 8. - Now Multiply both the numbers, (19 x 8) = 152, note down 52 and carry 1.
- Then Add both the numbers with carry,

i.e, (19 + 8 + 1) = 28. - Add 100 with this result,

i.e, (100 + 28) = 128. Note down 128 at the left of 52.

So, the final result is 12852.

Example #2 – Multiplication of Numbers More than 100

102 x 108 = ?

The result of this multiplication is, 102 x 108 = 11016.

Shortcut Tricks

- First of all subtract 100 from both the numbers,

i.e, (102 – 100) = 2 and (108 – 100) = 8. - Now Multiply both the numbers, (2 x 8) = 16, note down 16.
- Then Add both the numbers,

i.e, (2 + 8) = 10. - Add 100 with this result,

i.e, (100 + 10) = 110. Note down 110 at the left of 16.

So, the final result is 11016.

Example #3 – Multiplication of Numbers More than 100

113 x 103 = ?

The result of this multiplication is, 113 x 103 = 11639.

Shortcut Tricks

- First of all subtract 100 from both the numbers,

i.e, (113 – 100) = 13 and (103 – 100) = 3. - Now Multiply both the numbers, (13 x 3) = 39, note down 39.
- Then Add both the numbers,

i.e, (13 + 3) = 16. - Add 100 with this result,

i.e, (100 + 16) = 116. Note down 116 at the left of 39.

So, the final result is 11639.

Example #4 – Multiplication of Numbers More than 100

109 x 107 = ?

The result of this multiplication is, 109 x 107 = 11663.

Shortcut Tricks

- First of all subtract 100 from both the numbers,

i.e, (109 – 100) = 9 and (107 – 100) = 7. - Now Multiply both the numbers, (9 x 7) = 63, note down 63.
- Then Add both the numbers with carry,

i.e, (9 + 7) = 16. - Add 100 with this result,

i.e, (100 + 16) = 116. Note down 116 at the left of 63.

So, the final result is 11663.

### Few other examples of Multiplication Shortcut Tricks:

- Multiplication of Two digit number with another Two digit number
- Multiplication of Three digit number with Two digit number
- Multiplication of Three digit number with another Three digit number
- Multiplication of Four digit number with Two Digit number
- Multiplication of a number by 9
- Multiplication of large numbers by 5
- Multiplication of a number by 11
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range Below 50
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range above 50 & Below 100
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range Above 100 of Three digits
- Multiplication of less than 100-base Number tricks
- Multiplication of numbers new type shortcut tricks
- Multiplication a Number with 99
- Multiplying Numbers Ending In Zeros
- << Go back to Multiplication main page

We provide few shortcut tricks on this topic. Please visit this page to get updates on more Math Shortcut Tricks. You can also like our facebook page to get updates.

If You Have any question regarding this topic then please do comment on below section. You can also send us message on facebook.

best tricks i ever seen….thank u so much sir..it really help in calculation.

plz correct ex no 1 it may be confusing coreect at last in 1st ex 28 in place of 18

(28+100)

46789 * 26493,= ?

Best website to know the basic math tricks I ever seen.. Thank you sir.. This website helps me more for my aptitude xams..

super.thank u so much….Thanks for ur ideas….

This website is really very much helpful .Thanks