Home > Math Shortcuts > Simplification Practice Set 1

# Simplification Practice Set 1

## Simplification  Practice Set 1

Example 1: (1097 – 447) / 5 = 26 x ?
Solution: 650 / 5 x 26 = 5

Example 2: 640 / ? x 400 = 500
Solution : 640 x 4 / 5
? = 512

Example 3: 936 / 26 + (786 – 424 + ?) = 444
Solution : 36 + 362 + ? = 444
? = 46

Example 4: 585 / 39 x 336 / 42 = ?
Solution : ? = 15 x 8 = 120

Example 5: 5841 + 54084 – 264 = 1325.8 x ?
Solution : ? = 59661 / 1325.8 = 45

Example 6: 8.6 x 1.5 x 11.9 – 26.26 = ?
Solution : ? = 153.51 – 26.26 = 127.25

Example 7: (255 x 20000) / ? x 25 = 2550
Solution : ? = 5100000 / 102
? = 50000

Example 8: 4019.4 / (57.75 x 0.8) = ?
Solution: ? = 4019.4 / 46.2 = 87

Example 9: 69 x ? + 265 = 2749
Solution : ? = 2484 / 69 = 36

Example 10: 37 – 0.0037 x 100 = ?
Solution : ? = 37 – 0.37 = 36.63

Example 11: 55 x 14 / 11 – 54 = ? – 163
Solution : 70 – 54 = ? – 166
? = 182

Example 12: 25.5 x 12.5 + 35.25 = ?
Solution : ? = 354.

Example 13: 5 x ? = 9928 / 4
Solution : ? = 2482 / 5
= 496.4

Example 14: 2050.1 / ( 19 x 16.6) = ?
Solution : ? = 2050.1 / 315.4
= 6.5

Example 15: 15.5 x 18.5 x 11.8
Solution : ? = 3383.65

Example 16: 177 x 73 – 8080 = ?
Solution : ? = 12921 – 8080
= 4841

Example 17: 8052 – 9883 + 6048 = ? x 25
Solution : 8052 + 6048 – 9883 = ? x 25
14100 – 9883 = ? x 25
? = 14100 / 25 = 168.68

Example 18: 9536 + 6824 = ? x 40
Solution : 16360 / 40 = 409

Example 19: 5555 / 55 / 5 = ?
Solution : ? = 5555 x 1 x 1 / 55 x 5 = 20.2

Example 20: 5 x ? = 12042 / 4
Solution : ? = 3010.5 / 5 = 602.1

Example 21: 207 x 91 – 12060 = ?
Solution : ? = 18837 – 12060 = 6777

Example 22: 2495.5 / (23 x 15.5) = ?
Solution : ? = 2495.5 / 356.5  = 7

Example 23: 5824 + 8864 = ? x 40
Solution : ? = 14688 / 40 = 367.2

Example 24: 10000 / 100 / 10 = ?
Solution : ? = 10000 x 1 x 1 / 100 x 10 = 10

Example 25: 7825 – 9236 + 5234 = ? x 26
Solution : ? = 3823 / 26 = 147.03

Example 26: 14.5 x 17.3 x 11.8 = ?
Solution : ? = 2960.03

Example 27: 48 + 196 / 28 of 7 x 12 = ?
Solution : 196 / 196 x 12 = ?
? = 12

Example 28: 84 x 96 = ? – 125
Solution : ? = 8189

Example 29: 7200 / 12 x 166 – 5300 = ?
Solution : ? = 99600 – 5300 = 94300

Example 30: 34 x 14 – 136 – 26 = 89 + ?
Solution : 476 – 136 – 26 = 89 + ?
? = 340 – 26 – 89 = 225

Example 31: 7248 / 4 + 63 = ? x 25
Solution : ? = 1812 + 63 / 25 = 75

Example 32: (18 x 5) – (12 x 5) + 106 = ? / 4
Solution : ? = 136 x 4
? = 544

Example 33: (582 – 462) / 12 = ? / (-11)
Solution : ? = -110

Example 34: 7568 / ? + 9316 / 137 = 304.5
Solution : 7568 / ? + 68 = 304.5
7568 / ? = 236.5
? = 32

Example 35: (1740 + 4260 + 8520) / (750 + 390 + ?) = 11
Solution : 14520 / 1140 + ? = 11
? = 180

Example 36: (3692 + 2863 + 1410) / 125 = ?
Solution : 7965 / 125 = ? = 63.72

Example 37: 59.2 x 19.4 x 4.5 = ?
Solution : ? = 5168.16

Example 38: 146.45 / 29 / 5 = ?
Solution : 5.05 / 5 = 1.01

Example 39: 855 / 19 + 95 x 11 – 763 = ?
Solution : 45 + 1045 – 763 = ?
? = 327

Example 40: (800 – 435) / 5 = ? /7
Solution : ? = 73 x7 = 511

Example 41: 3440 / 8 x ? = 22790
Solution : ? = 53

Example 42: (44 x 31) + (71 x 9) = ?
Solution : ? = 2003

Example 43: (6474 / 26) x (114 / 19) = ?
Solution : ? = 249 x 6 = 1494

Example 44: (3939 x 0.35 / 5) x 6 = ?
Solution : ? = 275.73 x 6 = 1654.38

Example 45: 13.42 x 19.6 – 52.68 = ?
Solution : 263.032 – 52.68 = ?
? = 210.352

Example 46: 11.6 x 11.6 + 4.5 x 0.5 = ? + 13.42 x 3.5
Solution : 134.56 + 2.25 = ? + 46.97
136.81 – 46.97 = ?
? = 89.84

Example 47: 13.4 x 14.2 x 15.3 = ?
Solution : ? = 2911.284

Example 48: 7.8 x 3.3 x 3.5 – 7.2 x 5.2 = ?
Solution : 90.09 – 37.44 = ?
? = 52.65

Example 49: 3.3 + 5.5 x 5.9 – 17.29 = ?
Solution : 3.3 + 32.45 – 17.29 = ?
? = 35.75 – 17.29 = 18.46

Example 50: 9.6 x ? = 139785.6
Solution : ? = 139785.6 / 9.6 = 14561

Example 51: ? x 4232 / 46 = 52900
Solution : ? = 52900 / 92 = 575

Example 52: (13600 – ?) / 78 x 4 = 512
Solution : 13600 – ? = 9984
? = 3616

Example 53: (19891 + 14239 – 23352) x 12 = ?
Solution : ? = 129336

Example 54: (43 x 5.5 x 3.5) + 343 = ?
Solution : ? = 827.75 + 343 = 1170.75

Example 55: 17 x 12 – 693 / 21 = ? – 233
Solution : ? = 204 – 33 + 233 = 404

Example 56: 108 x 15 / 12 – 44 = ? – 119
Solution : ? = 210

Example 57: (56 – 188) / 4 = ? / (-12)
Solution : ? = -52 x -12
? = 624

Example 58: (35 x 8) – (17 x 5) + 57 = ? x 8
Solution : 280 – 85 + 57 = ? x 8
? = 252 / 8 = 31.5

Example 59: 19 x 7 + 189 – 31 = ? – 115
Solution : ? = 406

Example 60: 7.8 x 3.5 x 3.4 x 19 = ?
Solution : ? = 1763.58

Example 61: 43 x 81 / 9 / 3 = ?
Solution : ? = 129

Example 62: 2.0 x 2.5 / 0.5 x 26 = ?
Solution : ? = 260

Example 63: (4692 + 3863 + 2410) / 250 = ?
Solution : ? = 43.86

Example 64: ( 11.25 x 4.02 – 14.26) x 20 = ?
Solution : ? = 619.3

Example 65: 7685 / ? x 12.25 = 384.25
Solution : ? = 245

Example 66: 19476 x 17 = ?
Solution : ? = 331092

Example 67: 360 / 3.2 = ?
Solution : ? = 112.5

Example 68: 585 / 65 / 9 = ?
Solution : ? = 1

Example 69: 235 + 60 x 7 = ?
Solution : ? = 655

Example 70: 23.9 x 4.7 + 21.9 = ?
Solution : ? = 134.23

Example 71: 1.7 x 4.8 / 2.4 x 12 = ?
Solution : 1.7 x 2 x 12 = ?
? = 40.8

Example 72: 19 x 6 + 163 + 61 = 179 + ?
Solution : ? = 45

Example 73: (18 – 130) / 4 = ? / (-8)
Solution : ? = 224

Example 74: 767 – 5145 / 147 = ? x 37
Solution : 767 – 35 = ? x 40
? = 18.3

Example 75: 54.7 x 19.4×5.3 = ?
Solution : ? = 5624.254

Example 76: 4880 / 8 /.2 = ?
Solution : ? = 3050

Example 77: 3.3 x 5.9 x 7.7 + 12.8763 = ?
Solution : 149.919 + 12.8763 = ?
? = 162.7953

Example 78: 19.5 x ? = 6825
Solution :  ? = 350

Example 79: 377 x 135 – 2009 = ?
Solution : ? = 48879

Example 80: 95.25 x ? = 14763.75
Solution : ? = 155

Example 81: 23 x 24 + 28 x 29 – ? = 29 x 30
Solution : 552 + 812 – 870 = ?
? = 494

Example 82: 218.33 x 233 – 12888 = ?
Solution : ? = 37982.89

Example 83: 37 x 39 + 43 x 45 – 28 x 49 = ?
Solution : 1443 + 1935 – 1372 = ?
? = 2006

Example 84: 1036 + 116 = ? x 25
Solution : ? = 46.08

Example 85: (763 – 445) / 6 + 1 = 6 x ?
Solution : ? = 9

Example 86: 624 / ? x 4 + 86 = 182
Solution : ? = 26

Example 87: 0.09 x 2.5 x ? = 0.2466
Solution : ? = 1.096

Example 88: 744 / 32 x 0.4 = ?
Solution : ? = 11.625

Example 89: ( 508 + ? + 202) / (340 – 158 – 157) = 29.2
Solution : 710 + ? / 25 = 29.2
? = 730 – 710 = 20

Example 90: (15 x 6) – (17 x 4) – ? = 100 / 25
Solution : ? = 22 – 4 = 18

Example 91: 840 / ? x 500 = 400
Solution : ? = 1050

Example 92: (6.6 x 2.8 x 5.5) – (3.2 x 4.5 x 2.8) = ?
Solution : 101.64 –  40.32 = ?
? = 61.32

Example 93: 2425 / 25 + 400 / 50 = ?
Solution : 97 + 8 = ?
? = 105

Example 94: 7.8 x ? x 6.9 = 269.1
Solution : 53.82 x ? = 269.1
? = 5

Example 95: 1620 / 36 + (786 – 523 + ?) = 470
Solution : 45 + 263 + ? = 470
? = 162

Example 96: (689 / ?) x 4 = 318 / 3
Solution : ? = 689 x 4 / 106
? = 26

Example 97: 19 x 12 – 21 + 407 / 37 = 410 – ?
Solution : 228 – 21 + 11 = 410
? = 192

Example 98: 8606.4 / 66 x ? + 232 = 6100
Solution : ? = 5868 / 130.4
? = 45

Example 99: 936 / 26 + (685 – 523 + ?) = 440
Solution : ? = 242

Example 100: 608 / 38 x 336 / 42 = ?
Solution : 16 x 8 = ?
? = 128