Average methods shortcut tricks are very important thing to know for your exams. Competitive exams are all about time. If you manage your time then you can do well in those exams. Most of us miss this thing. We provide examples on average shortcut tricks

here in this page below. We try to provide all types of shortcut tricks on average here. Visitors please read carefully all shortcut examples. You can understand shortcut tricks on Average Methods by these examples.

So, before starting anything just do a math practice set. Choose any twenty math problems and write it down on a page. And, do first ten maths using basic formula of this math topic. You also need to keep track of the time. Then, write down the time taken by you to solve those questions. Now, read our examples on average shortcut tricks and practice few questions. And, after doing this go back to the remaining ten questions and solve those using shortcut methods. Again keep track of timing. And, this time you will surely see improvement in your timing. But, this is not all you need. You need to practice more to improve your timing more.

Few Important things about Average methods to Remember

Basically, you all know that math portion is very much important in competitive exams. And, it doesn’t mean that other topics are not so important. You can get a good score only if you get a good score in math section. You can get good score only by practicing more and more. The only thing you need to do is to do your math problems correctly and within time, and you can do this only by using shortcut tricks. Again it does not mean that you can’t do maths without using shortcut tricks. You may have that potential to do maths within time without using any shortcut tricks.

But so many people can’t do this. So average shortcut tricks here for those people. We always try to put all shortcut methods of the given topic. But it possible we miss any. We appreciate if you share that with us. Your little help will help others.

Now we will discuss some basic ideas of Average Methods. On the basis of these ideas we will learn trick and tips of shortcut average methods. If you think that how to solve average methods questions using average methods shortcut tricks, then further studies will help you to do so.

What is Average methods?

The result obtained by adding several quantities together and then dividing this total by the number of quantities is called Average. The main term of average is equal sharing of a value among all, where it may share persons or things. We obtain the average of a number using formula that is sum of observations divide by Number of observations.

Here is average based some fact and formula and some average shortcut tricks examples. The problem are given in Quantitative Aptitude which is a very essential paper in banking exam. Under below given some more example for your better practice.

Anything we learn in our school days was basics and that is well enough for passing our school exams. Now the time has come to learn for our competitive exams. For this we need our basics but also we have to learn something new. That’s where shortcut tricks are comes into action.

Average methods Formula

Average = ( Sum of Observations / Number of Observations )

Example

Find the Average of all numbers? There are Five Numbers, so Number of Observations here is 5.

Suppose Rahul covers a certain distance at X Kmph and an equal distance at Y Kmph. Then, the average speed during the whole journey is ( 2XY / X + Y ) Kmph.

Example #1 – Average Methods

The average of five positive integers is 55.8 If average of first two integers is 49 and the average of fourth and fifth integers is 69.5 Then find the third integer.

35

45

42

49

Show AnswerShow How to SolveOpen Rough Workspace

Answer: Option (C)

How to Solve 55.8 x 5 = 279 49 x 2 = 98 69.5 x 2 = 139 third number = (279 – 98 – 139) = 42.

Rough Workspace

Example #2 – Average Methods

The average of four numbers is 80. The first number is 1 / 3 of sum of three number. What would be the first number?

65

90

85

80

Show AnswerShow How to SolveOpen Rough Workspace

Answer: Option (D)

How to Solve P + Q + R + S = 320 ——(I) P = Q + R + S / 3 ——(II) from (I) and (II) 4P = 240 P = 80

Rough Workspace

Example #3 – Average Methods

The average of six numbers is 18, If average of four number is 12. What would be the average of remaining two number?

35

30

37

40

Show AnswerShow How to SolveOpen Rough Workspace

Answer: Option (B)

How to Solve (18 x 6) – (12 x 4) = 108 – 48 = 60 the average of remaining two number 60 / 2 = 30.

Rough Workspace

Example #4 – Average Methods

What would be the average of first 20 natural numbers?

11.5

12.5

10.5

11

Show AnswerShow How to SolveOpen Rough Workspace

Answer: Option (C)

How to Solve Sum of first n natural numbers = n ( n + 1 ) /2 So, we can find easily average of first 20 natural numbers 20 x 21 / 2 = 210 So, then Required average is = 210 / 20 = 10.5.

Rough Workspace

Example #5 – Average Methods

In a college, 16 girls has the average age is 18 years and 14 boys has the average age 17 years. What would be the average age of entire college?

17.54 Years

18.94 Years

17.74 Years

18.44 Years

Show AnswerShow How to SolveOpen Rough Workspace

Answer: Option (A)

How to Solve 16 girls has the average age is 18 years ( 16 x 18 ) = 288 14 boys has the average age 17 years ( 14 x 17 ) = 238 Average age is = 288 + 238 / 30 = 526 / 30 = 17.54 years.

Rough Workspace

Example #6

The average of five numbers is 64.6. The average of first and second numbers is 66 and the average of 4th and 5th number is 86. Find the third number.

21

19

20

13

Show AnswerShow How to SolveOpen Rough Workspace

Answer: Option (B)

How to Solve 3rd number is = 323 – ( 132 + 172 ) = 323 – 304 = 19.

Rough Workspace

Example #7

The average salary of 25 employee in a company per month is Rs.6000. If the salary of manager’s is added than the salary is increase is Rs. 6500. What would be the salary of the manager’s?

Rs.19000/-

Rs.22000/-

Rs.38000/-

Rs.15000/-

Show AnswerShow How to SolveOpen Rough Workspace

Answer: Option (A)

How to Solve Average salary of employee in company is = 6000 when added one member salry 25 + 1 = 26 = 6500. So, (26 x 6500)-(25 x 6000) = 169000 – 150000 = 19000

Rough Workspace

Example #8

What would be the average of first 20 multiplies of 5?

35.5

45.5

52.5

42.5

Show AnswerShow How to SolveOpen Rough Workspace

Answer: Option (C)

How to Solve Required average = 5 ( 1 + 2 + 3 +……………….. + 20) /20 = ( 5 x 20 x 21 / 20 x 2) = 2100 / 40 = 52.5. So, the Required average is 52.5.

Rough Workspace

Example #9

The average marks of 13 students is 40, the first six students is 30 and that of the last six students is 32. Find the value of the 7th number.

140

142

144

148

Show AnswerShow How to SolveOpen Rough Workspace

Answer: Option (D)

How to Solve Shortcut Tricks 7th student marks number = Total of 13 students result – ( Total of first six students + Total of last six students results ) 13 x 40 – ( 6 x 30 + 6 x 32 ) = 520 – 180 + 192 = 148.

Rough Workspace

Example #10

The average of five numbers is 29, if one number is exclude the average becomes 27. what is the exclude number?

37

38

39

40

Show AnswerShow How to SolveOpen Rough Workspace

Answer: Option (A)

How to Solve The exclude number is- ( 29 x 5 ) – ( 27 x 4 ) = 145 – 108 = 37. So, the exclude number is 37.

So, here we provide few tricks on Average Methods. And also visit this page to get updates on more Math Shortcut Tricks. You can also like our facebook page to get updates.

Also, if you have any question regarding Average Methods then please do comment on below section. You can also send us message on facebook.

Q. Ina maths test, in maths, 10 students scored 75 marks, 12 students scored 60 marks, 8 students scored 40 marks & 3 scored 30 marks . find the mean score. plse answer.

first find the total score of each student and sum it up.Then find total no of students and divide total marks by total students soln :sum of marks obtained by 10 students =10*75 =750 likewise 12 students=12*60=720 8 students=8*40=320 3 students=3*30=90 now next step is total marks obtained in the test is total marks=750+720+320+90=1880 now total no of student appeared in the test=10+12+8+3=33 so the mean score =total marks obtained/total no. of students=1880/33=56.97

average of 5 number means 5 x 64.6 =323 first and second numbers means 2 x 66 = 132 average of 4th and 5th number means 2 x 86 = 172 So, 323 – ( 132 + 172 ) = 323 – 304 = 19. third number is 19.

see avg. of four nos. is (P+Q+R+S)/4=80 take 4 on that side. P+Q+R+S=320 then given that P=(Q+R+S)/3 3P=Q+R+S then put this value in above equation P+3P=320 4P=320 P=80 i hope it helps u:)

The Average Weight of a Groups of Boys and girls is 38 kg.The Average Weight of Boys is 42 kg.and That of Girl is 33kg.if the number of Boys is 25 then number of Girl is

tricks are too good. but there is a little mistake in question no. 2. There is not a big issue because is anybody solve and learn that question he/she can understand but you should correct your mistake.

Sir solve this question if a shop keeper buy 2 dozen of egg on 6 rupees,6dozen eggs on 5 rupees and 4 dozen eggs on 4.45 per doze.find the average price of eggs.

I want answer.. Q..the average height of 12 students is 150 cm and remaining 18 students average height is 180 cm .what is the average height of a student in class?

I want answer Q:If the average weight of 35 students is 35 and if one new student is added the average weight becomes 36 then what is the weight of new student?

can you solve this? ek nav ke 10 naviko me se 56 kg weight wale man ki jagah par ek naya man ane se average weight me 800gm ki growth hoti hai naye navik ka weight?

A bag contains 6 mangoes, 4 apples and some oranges. The weight of a mango is equal to 2/3 of an apple and the weight of the apples is equal to 3/5 of an orange. If the total weight of the bag is 5.12kgs and weight of each apples is 240 gms.then how many oranges are there in the bag?

If you have any questions or suggestions then please feel free to ask us. You can either comment on the section above or mail us in our e-mail id. One of our expert team member will respond to your question with in 24 hours. You can also Like our Facebook page to get updated on new topics and can participate in online quiz.

Disclaimer:

All contents of this website is fully owned by Math-Shortcut-Tricks.com. Any means of republish its content is strictly prohibited.
We at Math-Shortcut-Tricks.com are always try to put accurate data, but few pages of the site may contain some incorrect data in it. We do not assume any liability or responsibility for any errors or mistakes in those pages. Visitors are requested to check correctness of a page by their own.

nice

Good

i want to know one ans..

qstn is: average of 10 numbers is7.. if each number is7 multiplied by 12 then what will be the present average

is the ans 50?

if each no. is multiplied by a no. then then the average of the nos. get multiplied by the same no. So the answer is 7 X 12 = 84

new avrage is 7*12 = 84

Ans 84

the answer is 84

very easy to learn.wow awesome

if each no. is multiplied by a no. then then the average of the nos. get multiplied by the same no. So the answer is 7 X 12 = 84

Q. Ina maths test, in maths, 10 students scored 75 marks, 12 students scored 60 marks, 8 students scored 40 marks & 3 scored 30 marks . find the mean score.

plse answer.

10*75=750

12*60=720

8*40=320

30*3=90

—————

1880/33 STUDENTS=56.96

first find the total score of each student and sum it up.Then find total no of students and divide total marks by total students

soln :sum of marks obtained by 10 students =10*75 =750

likewise 12 students=12*60=720

8 students=8*40=320

3 students=3*30=90

now next step is total marks obtained in the test is

total marks=750+720+320+90=1880

now total no of student appeared in the test=10+12+8+3=33

so the mean score =total marks obtained/total no. of students=1880/33=56.97

sravani says..

i didn’t understand the 2nd question,any one can help me

average of 5 number means 5 x 64.6 =323

first and second numbers means 2 x 66 = 132

average of 4th and 5th number means 2 x 86 = 172

So, 323 – ( 132 + 172 ) = 323 – 304 = 19.

third number is 19.

its easy one

see avg. of four nos. is (P+Q+R+S)/4=80

take 4 on that side. P+Q+R+S=320

then given that P=(Q+R+S)/3

3P=Q+R+S

then put this value in above equation

P+3P=320

4P=320

P=80

i hope it helps u:)

The Average Weight of a Groups of Boys and girls is 38 kg.The Average Weight of Boys is 42 kg.and That of Girl is 33kg.if the number of Boys is 25 then number of Girl is

let girls is x

25*42+33*x=38(25+x)

x=20

number of girls is20

I end understand it …can u plz repeat it

25*42+33*x=38(25+x)

x=20

Ans84

tricks are too good. but there is a little mistake in question no. 2. There is not a big issue because is anybody solve and learn that question he/she can understand but you should correct your mistake.

It is very useful for me to recall the formulae.Thanks a lot. It gives me hope to attend quantitive ability section.

Girls – 20 ( use alligation method)

And thanks for the tricks ….these are really usefull for exam …especially for ssc:-)

I wants advanced maths all short trick on my mobile number whatsapp.if anybody have plzz give me.plzz don’t abuse .number 9667760994.

Sir solve this question if a shop keeper buy 2 dozen of egg on 6 rupees,6dozen eggs on 5 rupees and 4 dozen eggs on 4.45 per doze.find the average price of eggs.

49

I want answer..

Q..the average height of 12 students is 150 cm and remaining 18 students average height is 180 cm .what is the average height of a student in class?

height of girls=12*150=1800

height of boys=18*180=3240

total students in a class = 12+18=30

average height of student in a class =5040/30=168 cm

168cm

is that 168cm correct sir?

I want answer

Q:If the average weight of 35 students is 35 and if one new student is added the average weight becomes 36 then what is the weight of new student?

Weight of new student = 36+35 = 71

71

can you solve this?

ek nav ke 10 naviko me se 56 kg weight wale man ki jagah par ek naya man ane se average weight me 800gm ki growth hoti hai naye navik ka weight?

Naye navik ka average 64

Explain formula of example8.

Nice …. what’s a basic formula for example 8

Its good

its very helpfull sir ,thank u so much sir.

A bag contains 6 mangoes, 4 apples and some oranges. The weight of a mango is equal to 2/3 of an apple and the weight of the apples is equal to 3/5 of an orange. If the total weight of the bag is 5.12kgs and weight of each apples is 240 gms.then how many oranges are there in the bag?

Explain super sir very useful