Average Methods Example 2

Average shortcut tricks are very important thing to know for your exams. Competitive exams are all about time. If you manage your time then you can do well in those exams. Most of us miss that part. Few examples on average shortcuts is given in this page below. We try to provide all types of shortcut tricks on average here. Visitors are requested to carefully read all shortcut examples. You can understand shortcut tricks on Average by these examples.

Before doing anything we recommend you to do a math practice set. Write down twenty math problems related to this topic on a page. Solve first ten math problems according to basic math formula. You also need to keep track of Timing. After finish write down total time taken by you to solve those ten maths. Now go through our page for average shortcut trick. After this do remaining ten questions and apply shortcut formula on those math problems. Again keep track of Timing. This time you will surely see improvement in your timing. But this is not all you want. You need to practice more to improve your timing more.

Math section in a competitive exam is the most important part of the exam. That doesn’t mean that other sections are not so important. But if you need a good score in exam then you have to score good in maths. Only practice and practice can give you a good score. You should do your math problems within time with correctness, and this can be achieved only by using shortcut tricks. But it doesn’t mean that without using shortcut tricks you can’t do any math problems. You may do math problems within time without using any shortcut tricks. You may have that potential. But so many other people may not do the same. So Average shortcut tricks here for those people. We always try to put all shortcut methods of the given topic. But if you see any tricks are missing from the list then please inform us. Your little help will help so many needy.

Average Methods Example 2
The result obtained by adding several quantities together and then dividing this total by the number of quantities is called Average. This is the basic theory of Speed Time and Distance which is applied in question to obtain answers here is Speed Time and Distance Methods of example 2 in different form of examples.
In maths exam papers there are two or three question are given from this chapter. This type of problem are given in Quantitative Aptitude which is a very essential paper in banking exam. Under below  given some more example for your better practice.

 

 

Example 1: In school the average age of 12 women is 18 and that of 16 men is 12 years. What is the average age of entire class ?
Answer : Total age of 12 women is = 12 x 18 = 216
Total age of 16 men is = 16 x 12 = 192
(216 + 192) = 408 / 28 = 144/7

 

 


Example 1:

The average age of 34 students in a school is 15 years, after that when geography teacher’s age is added to student age then the average age increases by one, what is the teacher’s age in years ?
Answer :
Step 1:T first we find the total student ages with out adding teacher’s age ( 34 x 15 ) = 510 years.
Now we find out the age of students adding with teachers age that is ( 35 x 16 ) = 560 years.
Step 2: Teachers age is ( 560 – 510 ) = 50 years.

 

 


Example 2:

The average age of 44 students in a batch is 18 years. The average age of 22 students is 14 years. Find average age of remaining 22 students ?
Answer :
Step 1: At first we find the age total age of 44 and 22 students is (44 x 18 ) = 792 and ( 22 x 14 ) = 308.
Step 2: Sum of the ages of 22 students is = ( 792 – 308 ) =  484.
So average age of is ( 484 / 22 ) = 22 years.

 

 

Example 3:  The average of a non-zero number and its square is 5 times the number. The number is.
Answer :   Let the number be x . Then,
x + x^2 / 2 = 5x
x^2 -9x = 0
x( x – 9 ) = 0 or x = 0 or x = 9
So the number is 9.

 

 

Example 4:
The weight of 5 tanks of 57Kgs, 42Kgs, 45Kgs, 63Kgs,74Kgs. Find its average?
Answer:
Average = 58 + 42 + 45 + 63 + 74 / 5
= 282 / 5 = 56.4.

 

 

Example 5: What is the average of the first 6 prime numbers  ?
Answer : 2 + 3 + 5 + 7 + 11 + 13 / 6
= 41 / 6 = 6.83.

 

 

 

We provide few shortcut tricks on this topic. Please visit this page to get updates on more Math Shortcut Tricks. You can also like our facebook page to get updates.

If You Have any question regarding this topic then please do comment on below section. You can also send us message on facebook.

Leave a Reply