## Multiplication a number with 99 Shortcut Tricks

Shortcut Tricks are very important things in competitive exam. Time takes a huge part in competitive exams. If you know time management then everything will be easier for you. Most of us miss this thing. Here in this page we give few examples on Multiplication a number with 99 shortcut tricks. These shortcut tricks cover all sorts of tricks on Multiplication a number with 99. We request all visitors to read all examples carefully. These examples here will help you to better understand shortcut tricks on multiplication a number with 99.

First of all do a practice set on math of any exam. Choose any twenty math problems and write it down on a page. Do first ten maths using basic formula of this math topic. You also need to keep track of the time. After finish write down total time taken by you to solve those ten maths. Now read our examples on multiplication a number with 99 shortcut tricks and practice few questions. After this do remaining ten questions and apply shortcut formula on those math problems. Again keep track of the time. You will surely see the improvement in your timing this time. But this is not all you want. If you need to improve your timing more then you need to practice more.

### Few Important things to Remember

We all know that the most important thing in competitive exams is Mathematics. That doesn’t mean that other sections are not so important. But if you need a good score in exam then you have to score good in maths. You can get good score only by practicing more and more. The only thing you need to do is to do your math problems correctly and within time, and only shortcut tricks can give you that success. But it doesn’t mean that without using shortcut tricks you can’t do any math problems. You may have that potential to do maths within time without using any shortcut tricks.

But, other peoples may not do the same. So Multiplication a number with 99 shortcut tricks here for those people. We always try to put all shortcut methods of the given topic. But it possible we miss any. We appreciate if you share that with us. Your little help will help so many needy.

### Multiplication a Number With 99

Now we show you a** Multiplication a Number with 99** using Shortcut Methods. Before doing that you need to remember or do few things. First of all you need to memorize the Mathematical Tables. Most of the students misses or ignore this part. But its very important to Memorize Tables to do your calculation quickly.

This thing is not possible to do in one day its obviously Need Practices.** You can Make a Note of tables and memorize it regularly at any time any place. So, keep practicing.**

### Example #1 – Multiplication of a Number with 99

79 x 99 = ?

- 7231
- 7491
- 7651
- 7821

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (D)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply the number with 100,

i.e, 79 x 100 = 7900. - Now, Subtract the number from the result,

i.e, 7900 – 79 = 7821.

So, the final result is 7821.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #2 – Multiplication of a Number with 99

69 x 99 = ?

- 6281
- 6541
- 6681
- 6831

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (D)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply the number with 100,

i.e, 69 x 100 = 6900. - Now, Subtract the number from the result,

i.e, 6900 – 69 = 6831.

So, the final result is 6831.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #3 – Multiplication of a Number with 99

78 x 99 = ?

- 7292
- 7532
- 7722
- 7942

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (C)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply the number with 100,

i.e, 78 x 100 = 7800. - Now, Subtract the number from the result,

i.e, 7800 – 78 = 7722.

So, the final result is 7722.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #4 – Multiplication of a Number with 99

64 x 99 = ?

- 6146
- 6336
- 6686
- 6956

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (B)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply the number with 100,

i.e, 64 x 100 = 6400. - Now, Subtract the number from the result,

i.e, 6400 – 64 = 6336.

So, the final result is 6336.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #5

59 x 99 = ?

- 5011
- 5491
- 5671
- 5841

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (D)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply the number with 100,

i.e, 59 x 100 = 5900. - Now, Subtract the number from the result,

i.e, 5900 – 59 = 5841.

So, the final result is 5841.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #6

47 x 99 = ?

- 4113
- 4433
- 4653
- 4983

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (C)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply the number with 100,

i.e, 47 x 100 = 4700. - Now, Subtract the number from the result,

i.e, 4700 – 47 = 4653.

So, the final result is 4653.

**Rough Workspace**

### Few other examples of Multiplication Shortcut Tricks

- 1. Multiplication of Two digit number with another Two digit number
- 2. Multiplication of Three digit number with Two digit number
- 3. Multiplication of Three digit number with another Three digit number
- 4. Multiplication of Four digit number with Two Digit number
- 5. Multiplication of a number by 9
- 6. Multiplication of large numbers by 5
- 7. Multiplication of a number by 11
- 8. Multiplication of a Numbers Range Below 50
- 9. Multiplication of a Numbers Range above 50 & Below 100
- 10. Multiplication of a Numbers Range Above 100 of Three digits
- 11. Multiplication of numbers more than 100 shortcut tricks
- 12. Multiplication of less than 100-base Number tricks
- 13. Multiplication of numbers new type shortcut tricks
- 14. Multiplying Numbers Ending In Zeros
- << Go back to Multiplication main page

We provide few tricks on Multiplication. Please visit this page to get updates on more Math Shortcut Tricks. You can also like our facebook page to get updates.

If you have any question regarding this topic then please do comment on below section. You can also send us message on facebook.