## Multiplication of three digit numbers

Multiplication of Three digit numbers shortcut tricks are very important thing to know for your exams. Time is the main factor in competitive exams. If you manage your time then you can do well in those exams. Most of us skip that part. We provide examples on Multiplication of Three digit numbers shortcut tricks here in this page below. We try to provide all types of shortcut tricks on multiplication of three digit numbers here. Visitors please read carefully all shortcut examples. These examples here will help you to better understand shortcut tricks on multiplication of three digit numbers.

Before starting anything just do a math practice set. Then find out twenty math problems related to this topic and write those on a paper. Using basic math formula do first ten maths of that page. You also need to keep track of timing. After solving all ten math questions write down total time taken by you to solve those questions. Now practice our shortcut tricks on multiplication of three digit numbers and read examples carefully. After doing this go back to the remaining ten questions and solve those using shortcut methods. Again keep track of timing. The timing will be surely improved this time. But this is not all you need. You need more practice to improve your timing more.

### Few Important things to Remember

We all know that the most important thing in competitive exams is Mathematics. That doesn’t mean that other sections are not so important. But only math portion can leads you to a good score. A good score comes with practice and practice. All you need to do is to do math problems correctly within time, and this can be achieved only by using shortcut tricks. But it doesn’t mean that you can’t do math problems without using any shortcut tricks. You may do math problems within time without using any shortcut tricks. You may have that potential.

But, so many people can’t do this. So Multiplication of Three digit numbers shortcut tricks here for those people. Here in this page we try to put all types of shortcut tricks on Multiplication of Three digit numbers. But it possible we miss any. We appreciate if you share that with us. Your little help will help so many needy.

Before going to this shortcut process we learned the multiplication of Two digit numbers and Three and Two digit numbers and we applied the shortcut process to obtain the result. Now we apply the same steps adding with new step.

### Example #1 – Multiplication of Three Digit Numbers

548 x 456 = ?

- 245638
- 249888
- 253728
- 258758

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (B)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply (6 x 8) = 48 (note down 8 carry 4).
- Then do cross multiplication( 5 x 8 + 6 x 4 + 4 (add carry)) = 68 (note down 8 carry 6).
- Again (6 x 5 + 5 x 4 + 4 x 8 + 6 (add carry)) = 88 (note down 8 carry 8).
- Again do cross multiplication and add carry (5 x 5 + 4 x 4 + 8) = 49 (note down 9 carry 4).
- Do multiplication of left numbers (4 x 5 + 4) = 24, note it down.

And finally the result we get is**249888**.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #2 – Multiplication of Three Digit Numbers

275 x 354 = ?

- 96310
- 96780
- 97000
- 97350

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (D)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply (4 x 5) = 20 (note down 0 carry 2).
- Then do cross multiplication (5 x 5 + 4 x 7 + 2 (add carry)) = 55 (note down 5 carry 5).
- Again (4 x 2 + 3 x 5 + 5 x 7 + 5 (add carry)) = 63 (note down 3 carry 6).
- Again do cross multiplication and add carry (5 x 2 + 3 x 7 + 6) = 37 (note down 7 carry 3).
- Do multiplication of left numbers and add carry (3 x 2 + 3) = 9, note it down.

And finally the result we get is**97350**.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #3 – Multiplication of Three Digit Numbers

395 x 284 = ?

- 101010
- 110550
- 111100
- 112180

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (D)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply (4 x 5) = 20 (note down 0 carry 2).
- Then do cross multiplication (4 x 9 + 8 x 5 + 2 (add carry)) = 78 (note down 8 carry 7).
- Again (4 x 3 + 2 x 5 + 8 x 9 + 7 (add carry)) = 101 (note down 1 carry 10).
- Again do cross multiplication and add carry (8 x 3 + 2 x 9 + 10) = 52 (note down 2 carry 5).
- Do multiplication of left numbers (2 x 3 + 5) = 11, note it down.

And finally the result we get is**112180**.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #4 – Multiplication of Three Digit Numbers

175 x 157 = ?

- 27475
- 27875
- 27995
- 28365

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (A)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply (5 x 7) = 35 (note down 5 carry 3).
- Then do cross multiplication (7 x 7 + 5 x 5 + 3 (add carry)) = 77 (note down 7 carry 7).
- Again (1 x 7 + 1 x 5 + 7 x 5 + 7 (add carry)) = 54 (note down 4 carry 5).
- Do cross multiplication and add carry (1 x 5 + 1 x 7 + 5 (add carry)) = 17 (note down 7 carry 1).
- Again (1 x 1 + 1) = 2, note it down.

And finally the result we get is**27475**.

**Rough Workspace**

### Few other examples of Multiplication Shortcut Tricks

- Multiplication of Two digit number with another Two digit number
- Multiplication of Three digit number with Two digit number
- Four digit number with Two Digit number Multiplication
- Multiplication of a number by 9
- A large number Multiplication by 5
- Multiplication of a number by 11
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range Below 50
- A Numbers Range above 50 & Below 100 Multiplication
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range Above 100 of Three digits
- Multiplication of numbers more than 100 shortcut tricks
- Less than 100-base Number multiplication tricks
- Multiplication of numbers new type shortcut tricks
- Multiplication a Number with 99
- Multiplying Numbers Ending In Zeros
- <<Go back to Multiplication main page

We provide few shortcut tricks on multiplication of three digit numbers. Please visit this page to get updates on more Math Shortcut Tricks. You can also like our facebook page to get updates.

If you have any question regarding multiplication of three digit numbers then please do comment on below section. You can also send us message on facebook.

this is superb no comperison of this

very helpful….Awesome tricks

Thanks a ton.

These tricks are taking more time to solve. But it can be helpful also.

These tricks r taking more time to solve. I want any shortcut method

i need an example of multiplication of 4 digit number with 3 digit number

great but not able to multiply 999 X 999 by this technique.Pl guide

then try this

999 x 9 = 8991 add two zero to the left of number then

999 x 9 = 8991 add one zero then

999 x 9 = 8991 lastly add all you will get the ans 899100 + 89910 + 8991 = 998001

U can solve 999X999 through this method. I have got the answer as follows:

1) 9×9=81 , note down 1 & carry 8

2)9×9+9×9=162+8=170, note 0 & carry 17

3)9×9+9×9+9×9=243+17=260,note 0 & carry 26

4) 9×9+9×9+26=188, note 8 & carry 18

5) 9×9=81+18=99 note down 99

Answer = 998001

999*999= 999* (1000-1)=999000-999= 998001

thank you for sharing

How can we solve four digit number with yhree digit ex 1013 and 981

How can we solve four digit no withthree digit for ex 1013 and 981

yes, u can use 0 infront of the 3 digit number. i.e. 1013 x 0981

Yes it can write down right to Left

1013×981

1) (3×1)=3 write down 3

2) (3×8)+(1×1) = 25 WD 5 Carry 2

3) (3×9)+(1×8)+(0x1)+2= WD 7 Carry 3

4) (1×1)+(0x8)+(1×9)+3= 13 WD 3 Carry 1

5) (1×8)+(9×0)+1=9 WD 9

6) (1×9) =9 WD 9

1013×981 ans is 993753

Really helpful! Cutting down my calculation time by 50%. Thank you!

very nice tricks….

Amazing…….it can overcome time management

i am trying to solve with method 973 x 434, i am not getting the correct answer given by calculator. pls can anyone solve with these number.