**Multiplication of two digit numbers**

Shortcut Tricks are very important th ings in competitive exam. Time is the main factor in competitive exams. If you know how to manage time then you will surely do great in your exam. Most of us miss this thing. Few examples on Multiplications of Two digit numbers shortcuts is given in this page below. All tricks on Multiplications of Two digit numbers are provided here. We request all visitors to read all examples carefully. These examples will help you to understand shortcut tricks on Multiplications of Two digit numbers.

Before starting anything just do a math practice set. Then find out twenty math problems related to this topic and write those on a paper. Solve first ten math problems according to basic math formula. You also need to keep track of the time. After solving all ten math questions write down total time taken by you to solve those questions. Now go through our page for multiplication of two digit numbers shortcut trick. After doing this go back to the remaining ten questions and solve those using shortcut methods. Again keep track of the time. The timing will be surely improved this time. But this is not all you need. You need to practice more to improve your timing more.

### Few Important things to Remember

Math section in a competitive exam is the most important part of the exam. That doesn’t mean that other sections are not so important. But if you need a good score in exam then you have to score good in maths. You can get good score only by practicing more and more. All you need to do is to do math problems correctly within time, and this can be achieved only by using shortcut tricks. But it doesn’t mean that without using shortcut tricks you can’t do any math problems. You may do math problems within time without using any shortcut tricks. You may have that potential.

But, other peoples may not do the same. So Multiplication of Two digit numbers shortcut tricks here for those people. Here in this page we try to put all types of shortcut tricks on Multiplication of Two digit numbers. But if you see any tricks are missing from the list then please inform us. Your little help will help others.

Traditionally Multiplications of Two digit numbers are very time consuming process. But you can calculate it very easily using shortcut tricks. Main thing is that you just follow the steps are given. If you learn it mentally then you perform it very fast and quick on two digit numbers.

### Example #1 – Multiplications of Two Digit Numbers

43 x 63 = ?

- 2661
- 2689
- 2709
- 2733

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (C)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 3 x 3 = 9. Note down 9 then,
- Do Cross-multiplication (4 x 3) = 12 and (6 x 3) = 18.
- Add both the result (4 x 3 + 6 x 3) = 30 and write down 0 to the left of 9 and carry 3.
- Multiply left hand side numbers (4 x 6) = 24 and add carry (24 + 3) = 27 and write down to the left of 0.

Finally the result we get is**2709**. (Try to calculate all four steps in mind).

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #2 – Multiplications of Two Digit Numbers

59 x 42 = ?

- 2478
- 2499
- 2519
- 2548

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (A)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 2 x 9 = 18. Note down 8 and carry 1 then,
- Do Cross-multiplication (2 x 5) = 10 and (4 x 9) = 36.
- Add both the result with carry (10 + 36 + 1) = 47 and write down 7 carry 4.
- Multiply left hand side numbers (4 x 5) = 20 and add carry (20 + 4) = 24 write down to the left of 7.

Finally the result we get is**2478**. (Try to calculate all four steps in mind).

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #3 – Multiplications of Two Digit Numbers

13 x 13 = ?

- 144
- 169
- 172
- 189

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (B)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 3 x 3 = 9. Note down 9 then,
- Do Cross-multiplication (1 x 3) = 3 and (1 x 3) = 3.
- Add both the result (1 x 3 + 1 x 3) = 6 and write down to the left of 9.
- Multiply left hand side numbers (1 x 1) = 1 and write down to the left of 6.

Finally the result we get is**169**. (Try to calculate all four steps in mind).

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #4 – Multiplications of Two Digit Numbers

87 x 33 = ?

- 2841
- 2859
- 2871
- 2899

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (C)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 3 x 7 = 21. Note down 1 and carry 2 then,
- Do Cross-multiplication (3 x 8) = 24 and (3 x 7) = 21.
- Add both the result with carry (24 + 21 + 2) = 47 and write down 7 carry 4.
- Multiply left hand side numbers (3 x 8) = 24 and add carry (24 + 4) = 28 write down to the left of 7

Finally the result we get is**2871**. (Try to calculate all four steps in mind).

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #5

38 x 27 = ?

- 1026
- 1042
- 1061
- 1087

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (A)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 7 x 8 = 56. Note down 6 and carry 5 then,
- Do Cross-multiplication (7 x 3) = 21 and (2 x 8) = 16.
- Add both the result with carry (21 + 16 + 5) = 42 and write down 2 carry 4.
- Multiply left hand side numbers (2 x 3) = 6 and add carry (6 + 4) = 10 write down to the left of 2

Finally the result we get is**1026**. (Try to calculate all four steps in mind).

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #6

17 x 19 = ?

- 292
- 303
- 313
- 323

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (D)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 7 x 9 = 63. Note down 3 and carry 6 then,
- Do Cross-multiplication (1 x 9) = 9 and (7 x 1) = 7.
- Add both the result with carry (9 + 7 + 6) = 22 and write down 2 carry 2.
- Multiply left hand side numbers (1 x 1) = 1 and add carry (1 + 2) = 3 write down to the left of 2

Finally the result we get is**323**. (Try to calculate all four steps in mind).

**Rough Workspace**

### Few other examples of Multiplications Shortcut Tricks

- Three digit number Multiplication with Two digit number
- Three digit number Multiplication with another Three digit number
- Four digit number Multiplication with Two Digit number
- Multiplication of a number by 9
- A large number Multiplication by 5
- Multiplication of a number by 11
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range Below 50
- Numbers Range above 50 & Below 100 Multiplication
- Numbers Range Above 100 of Three digits Multiplication
- Multiplication of numbers more than 100 shortcut tricks
- Multiplication of less than 100-base Number tricks
- New type numbers Multiplication shortcut tricks
- Multiplication a Number with 99
- Multiplying Numbers Ending In Zeros
- << Go back to Multiplication main page

We provide few shortcut tricks on Multiplications of Two digit numbers. Please visit this page to get updates on more Math Shortcut Tricks. You can also like our facebook page to get updates.

If you have any question regarding Multiplications of Two digit numbers, then please do comment on below section. You can also send us message on facebook.

very very cool and fantastic … I m glad about this site … I m working as maths teachers … so my duty without complete by book also have to explain this… so ur website is a nice way…I wil tell my students about ur website…..one small request is please also develop in regional laungages also…bcz it more helpful for village side students ……!!! thanking u….

Sir how to multiply short about 85×15=? Please reply sir

very much helpful.thank u very much for this great endeavour.very noble effort

very helpful

thank u ..

Very effectively……

not getting solution for 21 * 35????

1*5=5

2*3=6 5*1=5

1 carry and 15

3*2=6 + carry 1 i.e. 7

715 ?????

but ans is 735

1X5 = 5, put 5.

5×2 = 10,3×1 = 3 ( 10 + 3 ) = 13 put 3 carry 1.

3×2 = 6 , 6 + 1(carry) = 7

So, ans is 735

21*35=

1*5=5

(3*!=3)and(5*2=10) so 3+10=13 write 3 left to 5 and take 1 carry

now 3*2=6 and then 6+1=7 so the ans is 735

dont multiply 2*3

do it |ke

5*1=5

(1*3=3)+(5*2)=13

3*2=6+caary +1=7

so ans will be 735

21*35

1*5=5 please place it in the last and

do cross multiplication like this

21

35

2*5 & 3*1

not like this 2*3& 1*5

10+3=13

place 3 in left of 5

and finally multiply 2*3 and add 1 as carry then answer is 735

so nice its perfect trick to solve two digit multiplication digit quickly in mind…Thank you

thank you

very useful trick

thanks

Sir BT 69*78 its not coming since 7*9+6*8+7=119 how to do tat

please see the tricks applied on same way

69*78

Step 1: 9×8=72 last digit 2 and carry 7

Step 2′ (9×7) +(6×8) +7=63+48+7=118

Now put the 8 to the left if 2 and carry 11

Step 3: (6×7)+11= 42+ 11=53

Ans: 5382

How it possible for

18×21

19×21

Very help ful I will practice more .

Thanks Raj

It’s really awesome

Thanks arun, keep visiting

Tnk u vry much……diz is awesome. ….!????

Thanks a Ton for this extraordinary web site.

It will be help full for IBPS or SSC aspirants who cannot afford couching.

its an amazing source of learning

Very difficult to do n time taking

very nice tricks thanks

welcome keep visiting

97 * 69 didnt get that plz share it but trick is nice

So nice

i like it it is to nice

thank to website

whats 88*96 can any share the solution

Really helpful. And I can think that now I can do great on my mathematics olympiad. And I really appreciate what you’ve done . Thanks!

???????

nice, I like it 🙂