## Multiplication of a number by 11 shortcut method

Shortcut Tricks are very important things in competitive exam. Time takes a huge part in competitive exams. If you know how to manage time then you will surely do great in your exam. Most of us miss that part. Few examples on multiplication of a number by 11 shortcuts is given in this page below. We try to provide all types of shortcut tricks on multiplication of a number by 11 here. We request all visitors to read all examples carefully. These examples will help you to understand shortcut tricks on Multiplication of a number by 11.

First of all do a practice set on math of any exam. Choose any twenty math problems and write it down on a page. Do first ten maths using basic formula of this math topic. You also need to keep track of Timing. After finish write down total time taken by you to solve those ten maths. Now go through our page for multiplication of a number by 11 shortcut trick. After doing this go back to the remaining ten questions and solve those using shortcut methods. Again keep track of the time. This time you will surely see improvement in your timing. But this is not all you want. If you need to improve your timing more then you need to practice more.

### Few Important things to Remember

You all know that math portion is very much important in competitive exams. It doesn’t mean that other topics are not so important. But only math portion can leads you to a good score. You can get good score only by practicing more and more. You should do your math problems within time with correctness, and only shortcut tricks can give you that success. Again it does not mean that you can’t do maths without using shortcut tricks. You may have that potential that you may do maths within time without using any shortcut tricks.

But, other peoples may not do the same. So Multiplication of a number by 11 shortcut tricks here for those people. We always try to put all shortcut methods of the given topic. But we may miss few of them. If you know anything else rather than this please do share with us. Your help will help others.

Some times A large numbers are given with multiplication of 11 which is very time taking to calculate the numbers with 11 , So don’t worry here given the shortcut method to do quick calculation of multiplication of large numbers by 11 shortcut method.

### Example #1 – Multiplication of a Number by 11

2769 x 11 = ?

- 30459
- 30599
- 30709
- 30999

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (A)

**How to Solve**

- Firstly we Write down the Right most number of 2769, i.e, 9.
- Add the 9 + 6 = 15 (note down 5 to the left of 9 and carry 1) 59.
- Again Add 7 + 6 + 1 (add carry) = 14 (note down 4 and carry 1) 459.
- Again Add 2 + 7 + 1 (add carry) = 10 (note down 0 and carry 1) 0459.
- Lastly Add carry 1 to the left most number 2 + 1 = 3 (note down the number).

We get our final result that is 30459.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #2 – Multiplication of a Number by 11

1234 x 11 = ?

- 13234
- 13574
- 13794
- 13934

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (B)

**How to Solve**

- Firstly we Write down the Right most number of 1234, i.e, 4.
- Add the 4 + 3 = 7 (note down 7 to the left of 4) 74.
- Again Add 3 + 2 = 5 (note down 5 to the left of 7) 574.
- Again Add 2 + 1 = 3 (note down 3 to the left of 5) 3574.
- Lastly note down 1 to the left of number.

We get our final result that is 13574.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #3 – Multiplication of a Number by 11

2539 x 11 = ?

- 27009
- 27539
- 27759
- 27929

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (D)

**How to Solve**

- Firstly we Write down the Right most number of 2539, i.e, 9.
- Add the 9 + 3 = 12 (note down 2 to the left of 9 and carry 1) 29.
- Again Add 3 + 5 + 1 (add carry) = 9 (note down 9 ) 929.
- Again Add 5 + 2 = 7 (note down 7) 7929.
- Lastly the right most number 2 (note down the number).

We get our final result that is 27929.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #4 – Multiplication of a Number by 11

4739 x 11 = ?

- 51219
- 51569
- 52129
- 52579

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (C)

**How to Solve**

- Firstly we Write down the Right most number of 4739, i e, 9.
- Add the 9 + 3 = 12 (note down 2 to the left of 9 and carry 1) 29.
- Again Add 3 + 7 + 1 (add carry) = 11 (note down 1 and carry 1) 129.
- Again Add 7 + 4 + 1 (add carry) = 12 (note down 2 and carry 1) 2129.
- Lastly Add carry 1 to the right most number 4 + 1 = 5 (note down the number).

We get our final result that is 52129.

**Rough Workspace**

### Few other examples of Multiplication Shortcut Tricks

- Multiplication of Two digit number with another Two digit number
- Multiplication of Three digit number with Two digit number
- Three digit number with another Three digit number Multiplication
- Multiplication of Four digit number with Two Digit number
- Multiplication of a number by 9
- A large number Multiplication by 5
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range Below 50
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range above 50 & Below 100
- Three digits Numbers Multiplication Range Above 100
- Multiplication of numbers more than 100 shortcut tricks
- Multiplication of less than 100-base Number tricks
- New Type Multiplication shortcut tricks
- Multiplication a Number with 99
- Multiplying Numbers Ending In Zeros
- << Go back to Multiplication main page

We provide few shortcut tricks on this topic. Please visit this page to get updates on more Math Shortcut Tricks. You can also like our facebook page to get updates.

If You Have any question regarding this topic then please do comment on below section. You can also send us message on facebook.

hi m practise math tricks on this site nd I see muti by 11 by this trick is puzzle ….multi by 11 the same trick add 0 nd add original number answer same

Very correct

12340+1234=13574.this is more faster

47390+4739=52129

thank u very much

An easier method:

793748*11

(793748*10)+793748

7937480-793748=7143732

Thkuuu Soo much buddy… For this tricky gift…. It gonna be helping me too much in my xams