**Multiplication of numbers new type shortcut tricks**

Previous we learn different tricks now here we learn another Multiplication of numbers new type shortcut tricks.Traditionally this is very time consuming to calculate the numbers, So don’t worry here we given the another new type Quick shortcut tricks to do quick calculation by using of another Multiplication of Quick shortcut tricks.

Multiplication of numbers New type shortcut tricks are very important thing to know for your exams. Competitive exams are all about time. If you manage your time then you can do well in those exams. Most of us miss that part. We provide examples on Multiplication of numbers New type shortcut tricks here in this page below. We try to provide all types of shortcut tricks on multiplication of numbers new type here. Visitors are requested to carefully read all shortcut examples. You can understand shortcut tricks on Multiplication of numbers New type by these examples.

Before doing anything we recommend you to do a math practice set. Choose any twenty math problems and write it down on a page. Solve first ten math problems according to basic math formula. You also need to keep track of Timing. Write down the time taken by you to solve those questions. Now practice our shortcut tricks on multiplication of numbers new type and read examples carefully. After finishing this do remaining questions using Multiplication of numbers New type shortcut tricks. Again keep track of Timing. You will surely see the improvement in your timing this time. But this is not enough. You need more practice to improve your timing more.

You all know that math portion is very much important in competitive exams. That doesn’t mean that other topics are less important. But if you need a good score in exam then you have to score good in maths. A good score comes with practice and practice. All you need to do is to do math problems correctly within time, and only shortcut tricks can give you that success. But it doesn’t mean that you can’t do math problems without using any shortcut tricks. You may have that potential that you may do maths within time without using any shortcut tricks. But so many people can’t do this. For those we prepared this multiplication of numbers new type shortcut tricks. Here in this page we try to put all types of shortcut tricks on Multiplication of numbers New type. But it possible we miss any. We appreciate if you share that with us. Your help will help others.

Important Points to Remember

Point 1

In this type of Calculation check if the Sum of unit digit of both the numbers is equal to 10 or not.

Suppose, we need to multiply 67×63. Here unit digits are 7 and 3. Sum of these numbers are (7 + 3) = 10. So, we can use the below mentioned tricks here.

But, If we need to multiply 65×67, we can’t use the trick here. Because the sum of unit digits are not equal to 10. (5 + 7) = 12.

Point 2

Except the unit digits of both the numbers if the remaining digits of both the numbers are identical then only we can use the below mentioned tricks.

Note

If both the above points are satisfy then only we can use this tricks to calculate the multiplication.

Example #1 – Multiplication of Numbers New Type

87 x 83 = ?

- 7221
- 7451
- 7681
- 7891

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (A)

**How to Solve**

- Add the unit digits of both the numbers,

i.e, (7 + 3) = 10 [Point 1 is satisfied]. - Check if the remaining digits of both the numbers are identical or not.

In this case both the remaining digits of both the numbers are 8 [So, Point 2 is also satisfied]. - Now Multiply the unit digit of both the numbers,

i.e, (7 x 3) = 21. Note down 21. - Multiply the remaining digit with it’s one larger value,

i.e, (8 x 9) = 72. [8 is the remaining digit and 9 is the one higher value of 8 (8 + 1 = 9).]

Note down 72 to the left of 21.

So, we get our final result, 87 x 83 = 7221.

**Rough Workspace**

Example #2 – Multiplication of Numbers New Type

103 x 107 = ?

- 10311
- 10581
- 10891
- 11021

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (D)

**How to Solve**

- Add the unit digits of both the numbers,

i.e, (3 + 7) = 10 [Point 1 is satisfied]. - Check if the remaining digits of both the numbers are identical or not.

In this case both the remaining digits of both the numbers are 10 [So, Point 2 is also satisfied]. - Now Multiply the unit digit of both the numbers,

i.e, (3 x 7) = 21. Note down 21. - Multiply the remaining digit with it’s one larger value,

i.e, (10 x 11) = 110. [10 is the remaining digit and 11 is the one higher value of 10 (10 + 1 = 11).]

Note down 110 to the left of 21.

So, we get our final result, 103 x 107 = 11021.

**Rough Workspace**

Example #3 – Multiplication of Numbers New Type

62 x 68 = ?

- 4026
- 4216
- 4586
- 4906

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (B)

**How to Solve**

- Add the unit digits of both the numbers,

i.e, (2 + 8) = 10 [Point 1 is satisfied]. - Check if the remaining digits of both the numbers are identical or not.

In this case both the remaining digits of both the numbers are 6 [So, Point 2 is also satisfied]. - Now Multiply the unit digit of both the numbers,

i.e, (2 x 8) = 16. Note down 16. - Multiply the remaining digit with it’s one larger value,

i.e, (6 x 7) = 42. [6 is the remaining digit and 7 is the one higher value of 6 (6 + 1 = 7).]

Note down 42 to the left of 16.

So, we get our final result, 62 x 68 = 4216.

**Rough Workspace**

Example #4 – Multiplication of Numbers New Type

102 x 108 = ?

- 11016
- 11306
- 11676
- 11946

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (A)

**How to Solve**

- Add the unit digits of both the numbers,

i.e, (2 + 8) = 10 [Point 1 is satisfied]. - Check if the remaining digits of both the numbers are identical or not.

In this case both the remaining digits of both the numbers are 10 [So, Point 2 is also satisfied]. - Now Multiply the unit digit of both the numbers,

i.e, (2 x 8) = 16. Note down 16. - Multiply the remaining digit with it’s one larger value,

i.e, (10 x 11) = 110. [10 is the remaining digit and 11 is the one higher value of 10 (10 + 1 = 11).]

Note down 110 to the left of 16.

So, we get our final result, 102 x 108 = 11016.

**Rough Workspace**

Example #5 – Multiplication of Numbers New Type

94 x 96 = ?

- 8504
- 8874
- 9024
- 9264

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (C)

**How to Solve**

- Add the unit digits of both the numbers,

i.e, (4 + 6) = 10 [Point 1 is satisfied]. - Check if the remaining digits of both the numbers are identical or not.

In this case both the remaining digits of both the numbers are 9 [So, Point 2 is also satisfied]. - Now Multiply the unit digit of both the numbers,

i.e, (4 x 6) = 24. Note down 24. - Multiply the remaining digit with it’s one larger value,

i.e, (9 x 10) = 90. [9 is the remaining digit and 10 is the one higher value of 9 (9 + 1 = 10).]

Note down 90 to the left of 24.

So, we get our final result, 94 x 96 = 9024.

**Rough Workspace**

### Few other examples of Multiplication Shortcut Tricks

- Multiplication of Two digit number with another Two digit number
- Multiplication of Three digit number with Two digit number
- Multiplication of Three digit number with another Three digit number
- Multiplication of Four digit number with Two Digit number
- Multiplication of a number by 9
- Multiplication of large numbers by 5
- Multiplication of a number by 11
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range Below 50
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range above 50 & Below 100
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range Above 100 of Three digits
- Multiplication of numbers more than 100 shortcut tricks
- Multiplication of less than 100-base Number tricks
- Multiplication a Number with 99
- Multiplying Numbers Ending In Zeros
- << Go back to Multiplication main page

We provide few shortcut tricks on this topic. Please visit this page to get updates on more Math Shortcut Tricks. You can also like our facebook page to get updates.

If You Have any question regarding this topic then please do comment on below section. You can also send us message on facebook.

839478*625=? Can u send me the short cut trick’s for this problem. Thanks

very soon upload a new tricks which help u long digit multiplication please stay with us and visit www.math-shortcut-tricks.com

Thanks

since 5^4 = 625

append 4 zeros to the given number i.e 8394780000

then divide the number by 2^4 = 16

thus the answer is 524673750

since 625 = 5^4

append 4 zeros to the given number i.e. 8394780000

then divide this by 2^4 = 16

thus the answer is 524673750

Well done who had created this site.

Its very well trick to find product….I like it

we can extend the rule to any number of digits.

839478* 625 =524673750

Here, 8*5= 40

write 0 and 4 carry over

Then 7*5 +8*2 + carried 4 = 55

write 5 and 5 carry over (We get 50 )

then 4*5 + 7*2 + 8*6 + carried 5 =87

write 7 and 8 carry over (We get 750)

then 9*5 +4*2 +7*6+ carried 8 = 103

write 3 and 10 carry over(We get 3750)

This way 3*5 +9*2 +4*6 +carried 10= 67

write 7 and 6 carry over (We get 73750)

then 8*5+3*2 +9*6 +carried 6 =106

write 6 and carry over 10 (We get 673750)

then 8*2 +3* 6+ carried 10 = 44

write 4 and 4 carry over (We get 4673750

Lastly 8*6 + carried 4 = 52

We get 524673750 = Answer

very useful website

we need 4 digit number multiplication shortcut method

So lovely trick thank u sir

Can you explain short cut for this 4182 × 2814?

Very nice trick for this type multiplication..

gud one. 🙂

ty.

kudos to the people who created this website