**Multiplication of Four and Two Digit shortcut Tricks**

Traditionally Multiplication of Four and Three digit numbers are very time consuming process. But you can calculate it very easily using shortcut tricks. Main thing is that you just follow the steps are given. If you learn it mentally than you perform it very fast and quick of Multiplication of Four and Two Digit numbers.

Multiplication of Four & Two Digit shortcut tricks are very important thing to know for your exams. Time takes a huge part in competitive exams. If you manage your time then you can do well in those exams. Most of us skip that part. Few examples on multiplication of four & two digit shortcuts is given in this page below. These shortcut tricks cover all sorts of tricks on Multiplication of Four & Two Digit. Visitors are requested to carefully read all shortcut examples. You can understand shortcut tricks on Multiplication of Four & Two Digit by these examples.

### Few Basic things to Remember

Before starting anything just do a math practice set. Then find out twenty math problems related to this topic and write those on a paper. Solve first ten math problems according to basic math formula. You also need to keep track of the time. After finish write down total time taken by you to solve those ten maths. Now read our examples on multiplication of four & two digit shortcut tricks and practice few questions. After finishing this do remaining questions using Multiplication of Four & Two Digit shortcut tricks. Again keep track of Timing. The timing will be surely improved this time. But this is not all you want. You need to practice more to improve your timing more.

You all know that math portion is very much important in competitive exams. It doesn’t mean that other topics are not so important. But only math portion can leads you to a good score. Only practice and practice can give you a good score. The only thing you need to do is to do your math problems correctly and within time, and you can do this only by using shortcut tricks. But it doesn’t mean that without using shortcut tricks you can’t do any math problems. You may have that potential to do maths within time without using any shortcut tricks.

But, so many people can’t do this. Here we prepared multiplication of four & two digit shortcut tricks for those people. We always try to put all shortcut methods of the given topic. But if you see any tricks are missing from the list then please inform us. Your help will help others.

### Example #1 – Multiplication of Four and Two Digit Numbers

4295 x 19 = ?

- 81225
- 81415
- 81605
- 81885

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (C)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 5 x 9 = 45 (note down 5 and carry 4).
- Then do cross multiplication and add carry (1 x 5 + 9 x 9 + 4) = 90 (note down 0 and carry 9).
- Again do cross multiplication and add carry (1 x 9 + 9 x 2 + 9) = 36 (note down 6 and carry 3).
- Again do cross multiplication and add carry (9 x 4 + 1 x 2 + 3) = 41 (note down 1 and carry 4).
- Now multiply of left numbers and add carry (1 x 4 + 4) = 8, note it down.

And finally the result we get**81605**.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #2 – Multiplication of Four and Two Digit Numbers

3333 x 39 = ?

- 126347
- 127557
- 128767
- 129987

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (D)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 9 x 3 = 27 (note down 7 and carry 2).
- Then do cross multiplication and add carry (9 x 3 + 3 x 3 + 2) = 38 (note down 8 and carry 3).
- Again do cross multiplication and add carry (9 x 3 + 3 x 3 + 3) = 39 (note down 9 and carry 3).
- Again do cross multiplication and add carry (9 x 3 + 3 x 3 + 3) = 39 (note down 9 and carry 3).
- Now multiply of left numbers and add carry (3 x 3 + 3) = 12 , note it down.

And finally the result we get**129987**.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #3 – Multiplication of Four and Two Digit Numbers

5678 x 59 = ?

- 333542
- 335002
- 337532
- 339642

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (B)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 9 x 8 = 72 (note down 2 and carry 7).
- Then do cross multiplication and add carry (5 x 8 + 9 x 7 + 7) = 110 (note down 0 and carry 11).
- Again do cross multiplication and add carry (5 x 7 + 9 x 6 + 11) = 100 (note down 0 and carry 10).
- Again do cross multiplication and add carry (5 x 6 + 9 x 5 + 10) = 85 (note down 5 and carry 8).
- Now multiply of left numbers and add carry (5 x 5 + 8) = 33 , note it down.

And finally the result we get**335002**.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #4 – Multiplication of Four and Two Digit Numbers

3457 x 23 = ?

- 79511
- 79771
- 79961
- 80321

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (A)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 3 x 7 = 21 (note down 1 and carry 2).
- Then do cross multiplication and add carry (3 x 5 + 2 x 7 + 2) = 31 (note down 1 and carry 3).
- Again do cross multiplication and add carry (2 x 5 + 3 x 4 + 3) = 25 (note down 5 and carry 2).
- Again do cross multiplication and add carry (2 x 4 + 3 x 3 + 2) = 19 (note down 9 and carry 1).
- Now multiply of left numbers and add carry (2 x 3 + 1) = 7 , note it down.

And finally the result we get**79511**.

**Rough Workspace**

### Few other examples of Multiplication Shortcut Tricks

- Two digit number with another Two digit number Multiplication
- Three digit number with Two digit number Multiplication
- Three digit number with another Three digit number Multiplication
- Multiplication of a number by 9
- Multiplication of large numbers by 5
- Multipliy of a number by 11
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range Below 50
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range above 50 and Below 100
- Three digit numbers Multiplication
- Multiplication of numbers more than 100 shortcut tricks
- Multiplication of less than 100-base Number tricks
- New type Multiplication of numbers shortcut tricks
- Multiplication a Number with 99
- Multiplying Numbers Ending In Zeros
- << Go back to Multiplication main page

We provide few shortcut tricks on this topic. Please visit this page to get updates on more Math Shortcut Tricks. You can also like our facebook page to get updates.

If You Have any question regarding this topic then please do comment on below section. You can also send us message on facebook.

Very useful…

Pls provide short trick to multiply 9999×999×99

Yeaaahhh……

Thanks .Excelent work.

Pls upload 4 digit mul with 3 digit..

VERY VERY USEFULL THIS METHOD

BY SUPRIYA

Very interesting & very exciting

Very fantastic math trick

useful for this methods

four digit number multiplication with 12?

Yes you can

Thanks

Nice trick working