# Multiplication of Three and Two digit numbers

Multiplication of Three and Two digit numbers shortcut tricks are very important thing to know for your exams. Competitive exams are all about time. If you know time management then everything will be easier for you. Most of us miss that part. Few examples on multiplication of three and two digit numbers shortcuts is given in this page below. We try to provide all types of shortcut tricks on multiplication of three and two digit numbers here. Visitors please read carefully all shortcut examples. These examples will help you to understand shortcut tricks on Multiplication of Three and Two digit numbers.

Before starting anything just do a math practice set. Write down twenty math problems related to this topic on a page. Solve first ten math problems according to basic math formula. You also need to keep track of Timing. Write down the time taken by you to solve those questions. Now go through our page for multiplication of three and two digit numbers shortcut trick. After doing this go back to the remaining ten questions and solve those using shortcut methods. Again keep track of timing. You will surely see the improvement in your timing this time. But this is not all you want. You need to practice more to improve your timing more.

### Few Important things to Remember

Math section in a competitive exam is the most important part of the exam. That doesn’t mean that other sections are not so important. But if you need a good score in exam then you have to score good in maths. You can get good score only by practicing more and more. The only thing you need to do is to do your math problems correctly and within time, and this can be achieved only by using shortcut tricks. But it doesn’t mean that without using shortcut tricks you can’t do any math problems. You may do math problems within time without using any shortcut tricks. You may have that potential.

But, other peoples may not do the same. Here we prepared multiplication of three and two digit numbers shortcut tricks for those people. Here in this page we try to put all types of shortcut tricks on Multiplication of Three and Two digit numbers. But it possible we miss any. We appreciate if you share that with us. Your little help will help others.

Traditionally Multiplication of Three and Two digit numbers are very time consuming process. But you can calculate it very easily using shortcut tricks. Main thing is that you just follow the steps are given. If you learn it mentally than you perform it very fast and quick of three and two digit numbers.

### Example #1 – Multiplication of Three and Two digit Numbers

329 x 49 = ?

- 16121
- 16221
- 16341
- 16621

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (A)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 9 x 9 = 81 (note down 1 and carry 8).
- Then do cross multiplication and add carry (4 x 9 + 9 x 2 + 8) = 62 (note down 2 and carry 6).
- Then do cross multiplication and add carry (3 x 9 + 4 x 2 + 6) = 41 (note down 1 and carry 4).
- Now multiply of left numbers and add carry (3 x 4 + 4) = 16, note it down.

And finally the result we get is**16121**.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #2 – Multiplication of Three and Two digit Numbers

495 x 29 = ?

- 13945
- 14105
- 14355
- 14555

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (C)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 5 x 9 = 45 (note down 5 and carry 4).
- Then do cross multiplication and add carry (9 x 9 + 5 x 2 + 4) = 95 (note down 5 and carry 9).
- Then do cross multiplication and add carry (4 x 9 + 9 x 2 +9) = 63 (note down 3 and carry 6).
- Now multiply of left numbers and add carry (4 x 2 + 6) = 14, note it down.

And finally the result we get is**14355**.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #3 – Multiplication of Three and Two digit Numbers

295 x 19 = ?

- 5215
- 5435
- 5605
- 5755

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (C)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 5 x 9 = 45 (note down 5 and carry 4).
- Then do cross multiplication and add carry (9 x 9 + 5 x 1 + 4) = 90 (note down 0 and carry 9).
- Again do cross multiplication and add carry (2 x 9 + 1 x 9 +9) = 36 (note down 6 and carry 3).
- Now multiply of left numbers and add carry (2 x 1 + 3) = 5, note it down.

And finally the result we get is**5605**.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #4 – Multiplication of Three and Two digit Numbers

999 x 99 = ?

- 98211
- 98531
- 98761
- 98901

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (D)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 9 x 9 = 81 (note down 1 and carry 8).
- Then do cross multiplication and add carry (9 x 9 + 9 x 9 + 8) = 170 (note down 0 and carry 17).
- Then do cross multiplication and add carry (9 x 9 + 9 x 9 + 17) = 179 (note down 9 and carry 17).
- Now multiply of left numbers and add carry(9 x 9 + 17) = 98, note it down.

And finally the result we get is**98901**.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #5 – Multiplication of Three and Two digit Numbers

195 x 19 = ?

- 3615
- 3705
- 3875
- 3995

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (B)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 5 x 9 = 45 (note down 5 and carry 4).
- Then do cross multiplication and add carry (9 x 9 + 5 x 1 + 4) = 90 (note down 0 and carry 9).
- Again do cross multiplication and add carry (1 x 9 + 1 x 9 +9) = 27 (note down 7 and carry 2).
- Now multiply of left numbers and add carry (1 x 1 + 2) = 3, note it down.

And finally the result we get is**3705**.

**Rough Workspace**

### Example #6 – Multiplication of Three and Two digit Numbers

799 x 99 = ?

- 78491
- 78671
- 78801
- 79101

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (D)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 9 x 9 = 81 (note down 1 and carry 8).
- Then do cross multiplication and add carry (9 x 9 + 9 x 9 + 8) = 170 (note down 0 and carry 17).
- Then do cross multiplication and add carry (9 x 9 + 9 x 7 + 17) = 161 (note down 1 and carry 16).
- Now multiply of left numbers and add carry (9 x 7 + 16) = 79, note it down.

And finally the result we get is**79101**.

**Rough Workspace**

### Few other examples of Multiplication Shortcut Tricks:

- Two digit number with another Two digit number Multiplication
- Three digit number with another Three digit number Multiplication
- Four digit number with Two Digit number Multiplication
- Multiplication of a number by 9
- A large number Multiplication by 5
- Multiplication of a number by 11
- A Numbers Range Below 50 Multiplication
- A Numbers Range above 50 & Below 100 Multiplication
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range Above 100 of Three digits
- Multiplication of numbers more than 100 shortcut tricks
- Less than 100-base Number Multiplication tricks
- Numbers Multiplication new type shortcut tricks
- Multiplication a Number with 99
- Multiplying Numbers Ending with Zeros
- << Go back to Multiplication main page

We provide few shortcut tricks on this topic. Please visit this page to get updates on more Math Shortcut Tricks. You can also like our facebook page to get updates.

If You Have any question regarding this topic then please do comment on below section. You can also send us message on facebook.

difficult to understand

Practice it again for few times

Great trick!!!

Thank you. This trick will help my students.

Really it’s too gud after a long time start practicing. Once again I am sharper and fast by these shortcuts. I loved it.tanq u

very nice trick!!!!!!!!!! thanks a lot!!!!!!!

999*99=999*(100-1)=99900-99=99801

999×99=999x(100-1)=99900-999=98901

Nice tricks. Its really works…

Nice tricks.it is easy to understand and reduce timing

cool trick, but i don’t understand why you multiply across!

solve this

345*47

sir,

plz send me all mathematical tricks to improve my aptitude.

This is good..this will help us a lot….thanks a lot

really god sir… thanq sir …..

really a nice trick, it works. pls email me all the other tricks also. i will be waiting for u.

I didn’t understand second step itself (cross multiplication)

consider 1 2 * 3 4 cross multiply means we want to multiply 2 with 3 and 1 with 4 i.e 2*3 and 1*4.

It’s nice

Nice Trick. Its really works and I like it.

Thank you.

Hi,

Can you demonstrate how to apply the same technique for 108*77? I am unable to get the right answer.

Thanks