**Multiplic ation of Quick shortcut tricks**

Shortcut tricks on multiplication of a numbers range above 50 & below 100 are one of the most important topics in exams. Competitive exams are all about time. If you know how to manage time then you will surely do great in your exam. Most of us miss this thing. Few examples on multiplication of a numbers range above 50 & below 100 shortcuts is given in this page below. These shortcut tricks cover all sorts of tricks on Multiplication of a Numbers Range above 50 & Below 100. Visitors are requested to carefully read all shortcut examples. These examples will help you to understand shortcut tricks on Multiplication of a Numbers Range above 50 & Below 100.

First of all do a practice set on math of any exam. Choose any twenty math problems and write it down on a page. Do first ten maths using basic formula of this math topic. You also need to keep track of the time. After finish write down total time taken by you to solve those ten maths. Now practice our shortcut tricks on multiplication of a numbers range above 50 & below 100 and read examples carefully. After doing this go back to the remaining ten questions and solve those using shortcut methods. Again keep track of Timing. This time you will surely see improvement in your timing. But this is not all you want. You need more practice to improve your timing more.

We all know that the most important thing in competitive exams is Mathematics. That doesn’t mean that other topics are less important. You can get a good score only if you get a good score in math section. You can get good score only by practicing more and more. The only thing you need to do is to do your math problems correctly and within time, and you can do this only by using shortcut tricks. Again it does not mean that you can’t do maths without using shortcut tricks. You may do math problems within time without using any shortcut tricks. You may have that potential. But so many other people may not do the same. So Multiplication of a Numbers Range above 50 & Below 100 shortcut tricks here for those people. We try our level best to put together all types of shortcut methods here. But we may miss few of them. If you know anything else rather than this please do share with us. Your help will help others.

Numbers are given for Multiplication of a Numbers Range above 50 & Below 100 which is very time taking to calculate the numbers, So don’t worry here given the shortcut tricks Quick shortcut tricks to do quick calculation of multiplication of two digits numbers by using of Multiplication of Quick shortcut tricks.

Example #1 – Multiplication of Two Digits Number Range above 50 below 100

83 x 66 = ?

- 5008
- 5478
- 5628
- 5938

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (B)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 83 with 6 (First digit of second number) and the result will be 498.
- Add a 0 to extreme right side of the result, 4980.
- Multiply 83 with 6 (Second digit of second number) and the result will be 498.
- In final step Add both the result 4980 and 498 and we got our result 5478.

**Rough Workspace**

Example #2 – Multiplication of Two Digits Number Range above 50 below 100

52 x 51 = ?

- 2652
- 2932
- 3322
- 3762

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (A)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 52 with 5 (First digit of second number) and the result will be 260.
- Add a 0 to extreme right side of the result, 2600.
- Multiply 52 with 1 (Second digit of second number) and the result will be 52.
- In final step Add both the result 2600 and 52 and we got our result 2652.

**Rough Workspace**

Example #3 – Multiplication of Two Digits Number Range above 50 below 100

68 x 57 = ?

- 3126
- 3386
- 3646
- 3876

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (D)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 68 with 5 (First digit of second number) and the result will be 340.
- Add a 0 to extreme right side of the result, 3400.
- Multiply 68 with 7 (Second digit of second number) and the result will be 476.
- In final step Add both the result 3400 and 476 and we got our result 3876.

**Rough Workspace**

Example #4 – Multiplication of Two Digits Number Range above 50 below 100

89 x 69 = ?

- 5771
- 6141
- 6451
- 6891

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (B)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 89 with 6 (First digit of second number) and the result will be 534.
- Add a 0 to extreme right side of the result, 5340.
- Multiply 89 with 9 (Second digit of second number) and the result will be 801.
- In final step Add both the result 5340 and 801 and we got our result 6141.

**Rough Workspace**

Example #5 – Multiplication of Two Digits Number Range above 50 below 100

79 x 59 = ?

- 4281
- 4661
- 4881
- 5121

Show Answer Show How to Solve Open Rough Workspace

**Answer:**Option (B)

**How to Solve**

- Multiply 79 with 5 (First digit of second number) and the result will be 395.
- Add a 0 to extreme right side of the result,3950.
- Multiply 79 with 9 (Second digit of second number) and the result will be 711.
- In final step Add both the result 3950 and 711 and we got our result 4661.

**Rough Workspace**

### Few other examples of Multiplication Shortcut Tricks

- Multiplication of Two digit number with another Two digit number
- Multiplication of Three digit number with Two digit number
- Multiplication of Three digit number with another Three digit number
- Multiplication of Four digit number with Two Digit number
- Multiplication of a number by 9
- Multiplication of large numbers by 5
- Multiplication of a number by 11
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range Below 50
- Multiplication of a Numbers Range Above 100 of Three digits
- Multiplication of numbers more than 100 shortcut tricks
- Multiplication of less than 100-base Number tricks
- Multiplication of numbers new type shortcut tricks
- Multiplication a Number with 99
- Multiplying Numbers Ending In Zeros
- << Go back to Multiplication main page

We provide few shortcut tricks on this topic. Please visit this page to get updates on more Math Shortcut Tricks. You can also like our facebook page to get updates. If You Have any question regarding this topic then please do comment on below section. You can also send us message on facebook.

Thanks for this great work sir!

Nice good to see these shortcuts.

Nice now i can solve problem in less time

Nice absolutely great support sir

really very thankful to this website.easy to understand,now i can solve more digit multiplication within a minute.

Very useful

Great

Really ..its helpful …thanku sir for helping us